Global Patent Index - EP 1060798 A1

EP 1060798 A1 2000-12-20 - Unidirectional single piston ultrasonic transducer

Title (en)

Unidirectional single piston ultrasonic transducer

Title (de)

Einkolben Ultraschallrichtwandler

Title (fr)

Transducteur ultrasonore à piston unique

Publication

EP 1060798 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99810539 A

Priority

EP 99810539 A

Abstract (en)

Unidirectional sandwich transducer which includes a center mass (4) freely placed between two active transducer element stacks (2' and 2") and two end masses (3',3") where all of them are coupled only by rigid stress rod between two end masses and where one of two active transducer element stacks can be replaced by solid and acoustically passive isolator stack. The center mass is performing free and not attenuated single piston oscillations between two active transducer element stacks and two end masses realized by mutually opposite phase polarity of active transducer elements while driven by the same input electrical signal. The center mass is also performing free and not attenuated single piston oscillations between one active transducer element stack and one solid and acoustically passive isolator stack and two end masses. The transducer is using electrical and emitting acoustic energy only when placed in contact with some external mass and shape and size of externally contacted mass have no influence to transducer's center mass vibrations. When center mass is performing single piston movement and when transducer is not mechanically loaded the total transducer length is constant and two end masses are not oscillating. The transducer is ideal for agitating arbitrary distant and arbitrary shaped liquid and solid masses placed in different vessels or pipes transferring its vibrations via waveguide solid rod connected between the transducer and a loading mass. The single piston transducer connected perpendicularly to a solid tube can agitate different radial and circumferential tube vibration modes without the need of exciting longitudinal and axial tube modes. The transducer can also be used as vibration receiver or sensor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B06B 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/06 (2006.01); B06B 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/0611 (2013.01); B06B 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060798 A1 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030103

2001-11-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB LI NL

2001-09-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PROKIC, MIODRAG

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DK ES FI FR LI

2001-08-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KROHNE MESSTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

2001-08-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KROHNE MESSTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010618

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB LI NL

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI