Global patent index - EP 1060800 A2

EP 1060800 A2 2000-12-20 - Control device for high-pressure washers or the like

Title (en)

Control device for high-pressure washers or the like

Title (de)

Steuereinrichtung für Hochdruckreinigungsgeräte und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande pour des appareils de nettoyage à haute pression ou similaires

Publication

EP 1060800 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00111070 A

Priority

IT PD990125 A

Abstract (en)

A control device for high-pressure washers or the like which comprises a box-like machine body (11) containing a motor drive with a pump (12) connected at its intake, by means of a flexible hose, to a supply of liquid and at its delivery, by means of a flexible hose (14) which ends with a grip (15), to a delivery nozzle (16). The control device comprises a remote control (19) arranged in the grip (15) and capable of sending a signal to a receiver module (22) connected to a starter system (30) of the motor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 3/02; B05B 12/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 12/00 (2006.01); B08B 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/028 (2013.01); B05B 12/00 (2013.01); B08B 3/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060800 A2 20001220; EP 1060800 A3 20020123; IT 1307196 B1 20011029; IT PD990125 A1 20001211

INPADOC legal status

2003-04-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-11-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-10-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI