Global Patent Index - EP 1060801 A1

EP 1060801 A1 2000-12-20 - Device for fast cleaning and drying the inside of a helmet

Title (en)

Device for fast cleaning and drying the inside of a helmet

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum schnellen Reinigen und Trocknen des Inneren eines Helmes

Title (fr)

Dispositif de nettoyage et de séchage rapide de l'intérieur d'un casque

Publication

EP 1060801 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00440006 A

Priority

FR 9907237 A

Abstract (en)

System uses cleaning head assembly (40) that is located within shell of helmet. Cleaning solution is introduced into interior of helmet via supply conduits (35, 36). Cleaning solution is applied directly to interior surfaces of helmet such that cleaning can be affected. After cleaning process has been completed, drying flux of air is introduced such that interior of helmet is dried.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 9/00; B08B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/00 (2006.01); B08B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/006 (2013.01); B08B 3/00 (2013.01); B08B 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 29716924 U1 19971120 - HAGEMANN ANDREAS DIPL ING FH [DE]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 12 31 October 1998 (1998-10-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2794347 A1 20001208; FR 2794347 B1 20020913; EP 1060801 A1 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010629

2002-08-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-31 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020417

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI