Global patent index - EP 1060809 A1

EP 1060809 A1 2000-12-20 - Tube expanding tool

Title (en)

Tube expanding tool

Title (de)

Aufweitwerkzeug für Rohre

Title (fr)

Outil d' élargissement de tubes

Publication

EP 1060809 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00111236 A

Priority

DE 19924898 A

Abstract (en)

The tool (1) has an expander part formed by a thread-like web, which projects radially over a main body of the tool, and over at least half, pref. all of its length. The main body is axially connected to a shaft for clamping the tool in a drive unit (10). The working diameter of the tool increases gradually and continuously to the final working diameter, via one, pref. three threads. The end face of the web is rounded, and web and main body are a single integral part.

Abstract (de)

Das Aufweitwerkzeug (1) hat einen Aufweitabschnitt, der sich über einen Teil der Länge des Aufweitwerkzeuges (1) erstreckt. Das Aufweitwerkzeug (1) wird vor allem im Sanitärbereich eingesetzt, um die Enden (28) von Rohren (5) zylindrisch aufzuweiten. Um das Aufweitwerkzeug (1) so auszubilden, daß die Rohrenden (28) einwandfrei zylindrisch mit geringer Beanspruchung des Rohres (5) aufgeweitet werden können, ist der Aufweitabschnitt ein gewindeartig verlaufender Steg (27), der über einen Grundkörper des Aufweitwerkzeuges (1) radial vorsteht. Aufgrund des Steges (27) ergibt sich, in Vorschubrichtung des Aufweitwerkzeuges (1) gesehen, eine über den Innenumfang des aufzuweitenden Rohres (5) linienförmige Berührung zwischen dem Steg (27) und der Innenwand des Rohres (5). Da die Linienberührung schraubenlinienförmig erfolgt, wird das aufzuweitende Rohr (5) unter geringer Beanspruchung einwandfrei zylindrisch aufgeweitet. Das Aufweitwerkzeug (1) eignet sich zum zylindrischen Aufweiten der Enden (28) von Rohren (5), da hierbei eine Beschädigung oder Zerstörung des Rohres (5) vermieden wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 41/02; B29C 57/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 41/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19924898 A1 20001207; AT 262991 T 20040415; EP 1060809 A1 20001220; EP 1060809 B1 20040331; ES 2214192 T3 20040916

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130526

2014-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130525

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50005849

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120725

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120508

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120504

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120608

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100525

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2214192

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-05-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50005849

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010327

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI