Global Patent Index - EP 1060814 A1

EP 1060814 A1 2000-12-20 - Removing lost foam pattern coating residue from a casting

Title (en)

Removing lost foam pattern coating residue from a casting

Title (de)

Entfernung von Rückständen des verlorenen Giessmodells von einem Gussstück

Title (fr)

Elimination de residus d'un modèle perdu d'une pièce de coulée

Publication

EP 1060814 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99121791 A

Priority

US 33585199 A

Abstract (en)

In the lost foam casting of aluminum, coating a fugitive pattern with a refractory coating containing a thermally stable, water-insoluble, acid-gasifiable (e.g. CaCO3) compound, and contacting the casting, with the coating thereon, with an acid to dissociate and gasify the compound and rupture the coating. Preferably, any thermal degradation products from the pattern residing in the coating are neutralized to promote wetting of the coating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22C 3/00; B22C 7/02; B22D 29/00; B22D 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 1/14 (2006.01); B22C 1/16 (2006.01); B22C 3/00 (2006.01); B22C 7/02 (2006.01); B22D 29/00 (2006.01); B22D 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 1/14 (2013.01); B22C 1/165 (2013.01); B22C 3/00 (2013.01); B22C 7/026 (2013.01); B22D 29/002 (2013.01); B22D 31/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] EP 0899038 A1 19990303 - GEN MOTORS CORP [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060814 A1 20001220; EP 1060814 B1 20031008; DE 69911928 D1 20031113; DE 69911928 T2 20040722

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-09-20 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69911928

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111103

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101111

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69911928 P 20031113

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2003-10-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031008

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010206

2001-09-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI