Global Patent Index - EP 1060815 A1

EP 1060815 A1 2000-12-20 - Process for fabricating forged wide side walls of a continuous casting mould

Title (en)

Process for fabricating forged wide side walls of a continuous casting mould

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von geschmiedeten Breitseitenwänden einer Stranggiesskokille

Title (fr)

Procédé pour fabriquer des parois latérales forgées pour une lingotière de coulée continue

Publication

EP 1060815 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112461 A

Priority

DE 19927348 A

Abstract (en)

Production of a wide side wall of a continuous casting mold comprises deforming a copper blank in several hot forging steps to form a right-angled plate; further deforming the plate in the longitudinal direction with a straight saddle whose width is only a part of the width dimension of the plate and partially forging the funnel; quenching the plate and cold working; forging to produce a slanted final mold; and cold working with a narrow saddle.

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren zum Herstellen einer aus einem Kupferrohling geschmiedeten Breitseitenwand einer Kokille zum Stranggießen, insbesondere für eine Dünnbrammenstranggießanlage, die einen von der Oberkante ausgehenden, zu den Seiten und nach unten auslaufenden gewölbten Erweiterungs- bzw. Trichterbereich aufweist, ermöglicht es, die Breitseitenwände wirtschaftlicher und mit verbesserter Qualität zu schmieden, wenn in mehreren Warmschmiedeschritten der Kupferrohling über Zwischenformate zu einer rechteckigen Platte mit anschließender Ausbildung der Keilform sogleich in demselben Warmschmiedevorgang umgeformt wird, in einem abschließenden weiteren Warmschmiedevorgang die keilförmige Rechteckplatte in ihrer Längsrichtung mit einem geraden Sattel, dessen Breite nur einen Teil der Breitenabmessung der Platte bezogen auf deren Längsrichtung beträgt, weiter umgeformt und der Trichter dabei bereits partiell ausgeschmiedet wird, die Rechteckplatte danach abgeschreckt und kaltverfestigt wird, anschließend zur Kaltverfestigung und zur Erzeugung des keilförmigen Endformats über einen entsprechenden keilförmigen Untersattel geschmiedet wird, und in einem letzten Schritt der gesamte Trichterbereich mit einem schmalen Sattel kaltverfestigt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/057

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/057 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/057 (2013.01); B22D 11/0408 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060815 A1 20001220; EP 1060815 B1 20030903; AT 248668 T 20030915; CA 2311592 A1 20001216; CA 2311592 C 20080212; DE 19927348 A1 20001221; US 6311536 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SMS SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 50003501

2015-08-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50003501

- Representative's name: HEMMERICH & KOLLEGEN, DE

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003501 P 20031009

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE IT

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI