Global Patent Index - EP 1060816 A1

EP 1060816 A1 2000-12-20 - Device for adjusting strand guiding segments of a twin roll continuous casting installation

Title (en)

Device for adjusting strand guiding segments of a twin roll continuous casting installation

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Einstellen von Führungssegmenten einer Stranggiess- bzw. Giesswalzanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le reglage des segments de guidage du brin d'une installation de coulee continue entre cylindres

Publication

EP 1060816 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112629 A

Priority

DE 19928196 A

Abstract (en)

Device for adjusting opposite-lying guide segments in three positions of a continuous casting plant has a hydraulic cylinder joined to each guide segment. Different positions of the piston (8) correspond with all three positions and are determined by stop surfaces of the hydraulic cylinder. At least one of the stop surfaces is arranged outside of the cylinder. Preferred Features: The hydraulic cylinder is arranged on the outer side of the guide segments.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Einstellen von gegenüberliegenden Führungssegmenten einer Stranggieß- bzw. Gießwalzanlage in vorzugsweise drei unterschiedlichen Positionen, wobei jeweils ein Führungssegment mit einem Hydraulikzylinder (1) und das gegenüberliegende Führungssegment mit dessen Kolben (8) bzw. Kolbenstange (10) verbunden sind, wobei der Kolben (8) doppelt wirkend ausgebildet und zumindest einer der drei Positionen durch eine Anschlagflache im Zylinderinnern festgelegt ist. Die erfindungsgemäße Lösung gestattet, dass auf einfache Weise drei unterschiedliche Zylinderpositionen eingestellt werden können, die durch Anschlagflächen des Hydraulikzylinders (1) festgelegt sind, wobei zumindest eine der Anschlagflächen außerhalb des Hydraulikzylinders (1) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/128

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/128 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/128 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060816 A1 20001220; DE 19928196 A1 20001221; US 6463996 B1 20021015

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040909

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040512

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI