Global Patent Index - EP 1060838 A2

EP 1060838 A2 2000-12-20 - Door vice

Title (en)

Door vice

Title (de)

Tür-Schraubstock

Title (fr)

Etau pour portes

Publication

EP 1060838 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305115 A

Priority

GB 9914250 A

Abstract (en)

Disclosed is a door vice for use in supporting a door on edge when being worked, for example, to fit a door frame. The vice has a body (1) having ground engaging laterally extending feet (3). A notch (5) is formed in the body (1) and has upright opposing first and second sides (6,7). In the first side (6) is provided a first jaw (9) which is urged towards the opposite second side when a bell crank (11,13,14) pivots in response to the weight of a door descending onto one arm (13) of the bell crank. Thus the door is clamped between the jaw (9) and the second side (7) which provides an immovable rigid jaw. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 5/04; B25B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/04 (2006.01); B25B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/04 (2013.01); B25B 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060838 A2 20001220; EP 1060838 A3 20020717; GB 9914250 D0 19990818

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030118

2003-05-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI