Global Patent Index - EP 1060842 A2

EP 1060842 A2 2000-12-20 - Transmission element for delivering a torque

Title (en)

Transmission element for delivering a torque

Title (de)

Übertragungselement zum Übertragen eines Drehmoments

Title (fr)

Elément de transmission pour transmettre un couple

Publication

EP 1060842 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111749 A

Priority

DE 19926908 A

Abstract (en)

The transmission element has a shaft (4) with engaging section fitting into an opening and has a cross-sectional shape differing from a circle and which is constant over the length of the engaging section. The orientation of the cross-sectional shape changes over the length of the engaging section, but in only one rotational direction. The engaging section is shaped like a twisted column of cylinder.

Abstract (de)

Ein Element (1) zum Übertragen eines Drehmoments enthält einen Schaft (4) mit einem Eingriffsabschnitt (8), der beispielsweise an einem freien Ende des Schaftes ausgebildet ist. Mit dem Eingriffsabschnitt wird das Element in eine Öffnung (7) eines Bauelements (6) eingesetzt, das mit Hilfe des Übertragungselements verdreht werden soll. Der Eingriffsabschnitt (8) weist eine über seine Länge konstante Form und Größe seines Querschnitts auf, während sich die Orientierung des Querschnitts über diese Länge ändert. Beispielsweise kann sich die Orientierung in einer Drehrichtung leicht ändern, so dass eine tordierte Form entsteht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/008 (2013.01); B25B 15/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19926908 A1 20001214; EP 1060842 A2 20001220; EP 1060842 A3 20001227

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI