Global patent index - EP 1060846 A1

EP 1060846 A1 2000-12-20 - Bolt driving tool

Title (en)

Bolt driving tool

Title (de)

Bolzenschubgerät

Title (fr)

Outil de scellement de chevilles

Publication

EP 1060846 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112332 A

Priority

DE 19927614 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a piston guide (1) for a drive piston (6), which moves axially in the piston guide and is driven by a drive to perform a striking movement, to engage a fixing element to be positioned with the pin thrusting device. The drive piston has an outer sleeve (15) guided in the piston guide and a rod (24) that fits in the sleeve, which has a free end space to engage the fixing element.

Abstract (de)

Ein Bolzenschubgerät enthält in einer Kolbenführung (1) einen Treibkolben (6), der durch einen Antrieb ruckartig zum Eintreiben eines Befestigungselements in einen ggf. harten Untergrund angetrieben werden kann. Der Treibkolben (6) ist zweiteilig aus einer äußeren Hülse (15) und einem in die Hülse (15) eingesetzten Innenstab (24) aufgebaut. Die Hülse (15) übernimmt die Führung in der Kolbenführung (1) und die Abdichtung, während der Innenstab (24) zum Übertragen der Kräfte auf das Befestigungselement dient. Wenn der Innenstab (24), der durch das Auftreffen auf die Befestigungselemente verschlissen werden kann, verschlissen ist, kann er ohne Herausnahme der Hülse (15) ausgewechselt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25C 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/00 (2006.01); B25C 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/048 (2013.01); B25C 1/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060846 A1 20001220; DE 19927614 A1 20001221

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041201

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010518

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI