Global Patent Index - EP 1060882 A1

EP 1060882 A1 2000-12-20 - Imprinting system in a rotary press

Title (en)

Imprinting system in a rotary press

Title (de)

Eindrucksystem in einer Rotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Système à repiquer dans une machine rotative

Publication

EP 1060882 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00111001 A

Priority

US 33536999 A

Abstract (en)

The system has a printing roller (1), in which an axial channel (16) is formed that extends along the roller. A pressure head (21) arranged in the channel is arranged with a pressure surface parallel to the periphery of the printing roller. The pressure head can be raised so that it projects radially above the channel during the production run of the printing machine, using a hydraulic system.

Abstract (de)

Es ist ein Eindrucksystem in einer Rotationsdruckmaschine vorgesehen, welches das Auswechseln eines Eindruckkopfes (21) während des Maschinenbetriebs ermöglicht. Eine Druckwalze (1), die eine Offset- oder eine Flexodruckwalze sein kann, weist einen axialen Kanal (16) auf, in welchem ein oder mehrere Eindruckköpfe (21) angeordnet sind. Die Eindruckköpfe können wahlweise aus dem Kanal herausgefahren werden, sodass die Eindruckfläche (22) des jeweiligen Eindruckkopfes (21) radial über die Peripherie der Druckwalze (1) hinausragt. Alternativ zum ursprünglichen Konzept sind die Eindruckköpfe (21) auch axial entlang des axialen Kanals (16) bewegbar. Dabei können die einzelnen Eindruckköpfe in einen Druckabschnitt gebracht werden, der durch die Position, an welcher der Eindruck auf dem Produkt stattfinden soll, bestimmt ist. Der jeweilige Eindruckkopf (21) wird angehoben, um nur in dem Druckabschnitt (15b) einen Eindruck vorzunehmen, während die anderen Eindruckköpfe zurückgezogen im Kanal (16) verbleiben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/52; B41F 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 11/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060882 A1 20001220; EP 1060882 B1 20021023; DE 10026945 A1 20010104; DE 50000667 D1 20021128; JP 2001010019 A 20010116; US 6347582 B1 20020219

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50000667

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100527

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-05-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030522

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-05-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000667 20021128

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR LI

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010706

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001016

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI