Global Patent Index - EP 1060884 A1

EP 1060884 A1 2000-12-20 - Mounting device for flexographic printing plates

Title (en)

Mounting device for flexographic printing plates

Title (de)

Aufspannvorrichtung für flexographische Druckplatten

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'accrochage pour plaques d'impression flexographique

Publication

EP 1060884 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00110984 A

Priority

IT BO990311 A

Abstract (en)

A mounting device for flexographic printing plates which can be applied to a machine (1) for mounting at least one flexographic printing plate (10) and for performing print tests, the machine being provided at the front, in a horizontally parallel and mutually movable arrangement, with an impression roller (15), with a printing cylinder (9) which is meant to be covered by a mounting sleeve (11), and with optical means adapted to register points of the impression roller with points of the printing plate viewed by transparency, the printing plate being fixable to the mounting sleeve by means of double-adhesive tape, the device comprising a longitudinal member (20) which is parallel to the cylinders and forms, in an upward region, a substantially flat surface (21) which is co-planar with respect to the upper plane of tangency of the printing cylinder (9) and lies in front of it. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 27/00; B41F 5/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 5/20 (2006.01); B41F 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 5/20 (2013.01); B41F 27/005 (2013.01); B41P 2227/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060884 A1 20001220; IT 1309286 B1 20020122; IT BO990311 A1 20001211; IT BO990311 D0 19990608

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-14 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020614

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020314

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: MK PAYMENT 20010611;RO PAYMENT 20010611;SI PAYMENT 20010611

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010611

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI