Global Patent Index - EP 1060888 A1

EP 1060888 A1 2000-12-20 - Cleaning device for the graphic industry

Title (en)

Cleaning device for the graphic industry

Title (de)

Reinigungsvorrichtung für die graphische Industrie

Title (fr)

Dispositif de nettoyage pour l'industrie graphique

Publication

EP 1060888 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107021 A

Priority

DE 19920231 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19920231A1] An air pressure system pushes the D-shaped bar (7) towards the rotating roller (2). The cleaning cloth moves (36) in a direction opposed to the direction of rotation (38) of the drum and brushes over the dirty surface (4) of the roller. The cleaning cloth (10) is unwound from a first reel (12) and wound onto a second reel (14). An air-pressure control system (34) regulates the pressure in the air chamber (8) for pressing the D-shaped bar against the roller and controls valves (22,24) connected to a high-pressure air supply.

Abstract (de)

Reinigunsvorrichtung für die grafische Industrie zum Reinigen einer laufenden Schmutzfläche (4) durch ein mit einem Andrückelement (6) an sie andrückbaren Reinigungstuch (10). Ein Druckregler (32) erzeugt einen Luftdruck, welcher kleiner als der Luftdruck einer Luftdruckquelle (26) ist, jedoch größer ist als der Sollwert zum Andrücken eines Andrückelementes (6) an die Schmutzfläche (38). Eine Druckbegrenzungsmaßnahme (30) sorgt jedoch dafür, daß sich der Luftdruck am Andrückelement (6) nicht auf den Druck des Druckreglers, sondern auf einen darunter liegenden Sollwert einstellt. Dadurch wird erreicht, daß der Luftdruck der Druckquelle (26) schnell von ihr zu dem Andrückelement (6) gelangt und dieses an die Schmutzfläche andrückt, jedoch der am Andrückelement (6) wirkende Luftdruck auf den Sollwert begrenzt wird. Als Druckbegrenzungsmaßnahme ist ein Überdruckventil (30) oder ein Druckschalter (31) vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2013.01); B41P 2235/246 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] US 4344361 A 19820817 - MACPHEE JOHN, et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060888 A1 20001220; EP 1060888 B1 20030521; DE 19920231 A1 20001109; DE 20006040 U1 20000615

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002238

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002238

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130330

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120324

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2003-11-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-08-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002238 P 20030626

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2002-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BALDWIN GERMANY GMBH

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001028

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI