Global Patent Index - EP 1060906 A3

EP 1060906 A3 2001-04-04 - Book cover

Title (en)

Book cover

Title (de)

Einbanddecke

Title (fr)

Couverture de livre

Publication

EP 1060906 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00111538 A

Priority

IT UD990038 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1060906A2] Outer cover for covering books comprising a sheet (13) cut to size and having two end flaps, first (12a) and second (12b) folded back on themselves, each in correspondence with a respective lateral fold (112a) and sealed to said sheet (13) on two opposite peripheral sides (112b, 112c), said flaps (12a, 12b) having the respective front sides (112d) open and defining an open zone (15) in which to position the spine of the book (11) and suitable for respective parts (14a, 14b) of the inner cover of the book (11) to be inserted, said outer cover (10) including a median axis (16) substantially equidistant from said lateral folds (112a), said two flaps (12a, 12b) being different in width, so that said open zone (15) is laterally off-set with respect to said median axis (16). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060906 A2 20001220; EP 1060906 A3 20010404; EP 1060906 B1 20040331; EP 1060906 B3 20100217; AT 263035 T 20040415; DE 60009390 D1 20040506; DE 60009390 T2 20050310; DE 60009390 T3 20100909; DK 1060906 T3 20040726; DK 1060906 T5 20100614; ES 2218028 T3 20041116; ES 2218028 T7 20110801; IT 248065 Y1 20021209; IT UD990038 U1 20001130; IT UD990038 V0 19990531; PT 1060906 E 20040831; SI EP1060906 T1 20040831

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170516

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170509

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170512

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170601

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170509

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-07-21 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20100401184

2010-06-14 [REG DK T5] CORRECTED TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2010-05-26 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-02-26 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: RICHIESTA DI IMITAZIONE RIGETTATO

2009-09-03 [REG DE 8505] EP PATENT AMENDED AFTER LIMITATION PROCEEDINGS AT EPO

2009-06-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-05-06 [LIM1] LIMITATION IS ADMISSIBLE

- Free text: SEQUENCE NO: 1; FILED AFTER OPPOSITION PERIOD

2008-12-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2008-10-31 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: COLIBRI&APOS; SYSTEM SPA; IT

- Effective date: 20080903

2008-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: COLIBRI' SYSTEM S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20080626

2008-08-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2008-07-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: COLIBR? SYSTEM S.P.A.

- Free text: CUMIN, CRISTIANO#VIA E. DAL BEN, 3#34072 GRADISCA D'ISONZO (GO) (IT) -TRANSFER TO- COLIBR? SYSTEM S.P.A.#VIA CERNUSCHI ENRICO 4#20129 MILANO (MI) (IT)

2008-07-10 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: COLIBRI' SYSTEM S.P.A., PT

- Effective date: 20080630

2005-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050530

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2218028 T3

2004-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040607

2004-07-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-06-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-14 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040401697

2004-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60009390 P 20040506

2004-05-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20011003

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011003

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI