Global Patent Index - EP 1060907 A2

EP 1060907 A2 2000-12-20 - Compact newspaper

Title (en)

Compact newspaper

Title (de)

Kompakte Zeitung

Title (fr)

Journal compact

Publication

EP 1060907 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00110981 A

Priority

IT MI990384 U

Abstract (en)

A newspaper comprising a sheet which is divided into two halves (2,3), each of which can be folded into at least four portions (2a-2d,3a-3d), in order to obtain, in three steps for folding the sheet, a sheet size which is equal to the size of one of the four portions into which each half of the sheet is divided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060907 A2 20001220; EP 1060907 A3 20010704; EP 1060907 B1 20060726; IT 246787 Y1 20020410; IT MI990384 U1 20001211; IT MI990384 V0 19990611

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130529

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120516

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070427

2006-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): IT

2006-07-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060726

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030916

2002-05-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: IT

2002-03-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011228

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): IT

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI