Global Patent Index - EP 1060911 A2

EP 1060911 A2 2000-12-20 - Method and apparatus for producing ceramic items having monochromatic and polychromatic veins

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for producing ceramic items having monochromatic and polychromatic veins

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von keramischen Gegenständen mit monochromatischen und polychromatischen Adern

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour la fabrication de produits céramiques avec veines monochromatiques et polychromatiques

Publication

EP 1060911 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00111823 A

Priority

IT MO990132 A

Abstract (en)

A method for producing ceramic items with monochromatic and polychromatic veins which consists in providing, in an apparatus composed of a vessel (2) which has at least one inlet port (3) and a discharge port (4), a multiple stratification of variously colored material in the fluid state; in inducing, by way of appropriate means, an outflow of a flow of the colored material through the discharge port with a strictly laminar motion; in conveying, through a corresponding duct (5), the flow into corresponding impressions of molds (6); and in placing the outlet of the duct (5) in a variously immersed and orientated position in the impressions. The apparatus for carrying out the method. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44F 9/04; B28B 17/02; B28C 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/18 (2006.01); B01F 5/24 (2006.01); B01F 15/02 (2006.01); B28B 1/00 (2006.01); B28B 13/02 (2006.01); B44D 3/06 (2006.01); B44F 5/00 (2006.01); B01F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44F 5/00 (2013.01); B01F 3/18 (2013.01); B01F 5/241 (2013.01); B01F 15/0272 (2013.01); B01F 15/028 (2013.01); B28B 1/005 (2013.01); B28B 13/021 (2013.01); B44D 3/06 (2013.01); B01F 3/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060911 A2 20001220; EP 1060911 A3 20030115; IT 1310615 B1 20020219; IT MO990132 A1 20001215; IT MO990132 D0 19990615

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-11-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 44F 9/04 A, 7B 28B 17/02 B, 7B 28C 1/00 B, 7B 28B 1/00 B

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI