Global patent index - EP 1060968 A1

EP 1060968 A1 2000-12-20 - Railway wagon with a platform displaceable vertically to its plane

Title (en)

Railway wagon with a platform displaceable vertically to its plane

Title (de)

Güterzugwagen mit senkrecht zu ihrer Ebene verschiebbarer Ladefläche

Title (fr)

Wagon ferroviaire à plate-forme mobile en translation perpendiculairement à son plan

Publication

EP 1060968 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401535 A

Priority

FR 9907499 A

Abstract (en)

The platform (4), movable between two walls (5) extends in the wagon longitudinal direction. It is joined by links (7) to the lifting motor (60) in order to be raised or lowered. The links include two rods (70) each fixed to a motor and chains (71) each fixed to a rod and to the other end of the platform. The fixing points of the chains and the rod and to the platform are regularly spaced. Each chain is supported by a return pulley carried by the side wall along which the rod extends so that when the rods are displaced longitudinally the platform is displaced perpendicularly to its plane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 3/04; B61D 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 3/04 (2006.01); B61D 3/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 3/04 (2013.01); B61D 3/184 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060968 A1 20001220; EP 1060968 B1 20040324; AT 262436 T 20040415; DE 60009207 D1 20040429; DE 60009207 T2 20050217; DK 1060968 T3 20040726; ES 2215580 T3 20041016; FR 2794706 A1 20001215; FR 2794706 B1 20010921; PT 1060968 E 20040730

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160610

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC

- Ref Document Number: 262436

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140919

2014-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE , CH

2014-05-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60009207

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140416

2014-05-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60009207

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: LAVOIX MUNICH, DE

- Effective date: 20140416

2014-05-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20140408

2014-04-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60009207

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: LAVOIX MUNICH, DE

2014-03-05 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20140226

2014-02-28 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20140217

2014-02-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140123 AND 20140129

2014-02-17 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-02-10 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20140130

2014-02-06 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20140130

2013-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2013-12-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2011-04-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-03-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2011-02-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2009-10-30 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090507

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090514

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-19 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2215580

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-07-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040527

2004-07-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-07-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-07-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-06-14 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20040401659

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2004-05-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDU

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60009207

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: RO

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20010620

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010620

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROBERT, JEAN-CLAUDE

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHAPPET, PHILIPPE

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LAMBERT, MICHEL CLAUDE

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI