Global patent index - EP 1060983 A1

EP 1060983 A1 2000-12-20 - Device for cleaning the external surfaces of boats or yachts

Title (en)

Device for cleaning the external surfaces of boats or yachts

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Reinigen der Aussenflächen von Booten und Yachten

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le nettoyage de surfaces externes de bateaux ou de yachts

Publication

EP 1060983 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99111571 A

Priority

EP 99111571 A

Abstract (en)

Supports (3) lock a boat's body (4) in a washing area (1). Cleaning units consist of water jet nozzles, rotating roller-shaped brushes (12) and other cleaning devices. The washing area is built in the inner space of an opening and closing floating dock (2). Other cleaning devices include plates for transmitting ultrasonic waves.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zum Reinigen der Außenflächen von Booten und Yachten besteht aus Stützen (3,22) zum Arretieren des Bootskörpers (4) in einer Waschzone (1) sowie Reinigungsaggregaten, die durch Wasserspritzdüsen (11), rotierende, walzenförmige Bürsten (12) und weitere Reinigungseinrichtungen (8) gebildet werden. Die Waschzone (1) ist im Innenraum eines offen- und schließbaren Schwimmdocks (2) angeordnet. Als weitere Reinigungseinrichtungen sind Platten (8) zur Aussendung von Ultraschallwellen angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 59/06; B63C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 59/06 (2006.01); B63C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 59/06 (2013.01); B63C 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] FR 2612875 A1 19880930 - VANEK MICHEL [FR]
  • [A] GB 2233881 A 19910123 - WRIGHT WINSTON THOMAS PATRICK
  • [A] US 4784078 A 19881115 - FEURT LEO D [US]
  • [Y] HILL FREEMAN K: "Ultrasonic Technique for Cleaning Ship Hulls", NAVY TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., vol. 11, no. 1, September 1985 (1985-09-01), OFFICE OF NAVAL RESEARCH. ARLINGTON, VA, US, pages 91 - 95, XP002122074
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 005, no. 039 (M - 059) 14 March 1981 (1981-03-14)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060983 A1 20001220

INPADOC legal status

2002-08-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020103

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI