Global Patent Index - EP 1060988 A1

EP 1060988 A1 2000-12-20 - Method and device for making and applying a flexible heat-shrinkable hood on palletized load

Title (en)

Method and device for making and applying a flexible heat-shrinkable hood on palletized load

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen und Anbringen einer flexiblen heissschrumpfbaren Haube auf einer palletizierten Ladung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de mise en forme et de dépose d'une housse souple thermorétractable sur une charge palettisée

Publication

EP 1060988 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00410053 A

Priority

FR 9907597 A

Abstract (en)

The device for forming and placing a thermo-retractable cover on a load (1) comprises a gripping robot (R). The robot comprises a motorized accumulator roller (9), on which is wound a part of the wrapping, held by a retaining clip (10). It also comprises an arm (8) for transferring the wrapping between a winding and cutting position and placing position of the cover on the palletized load. The transfer arm translates horizontally on a slide (30) which translates vertically along a fixed frame (7). The wrapping spacing mechanism is provided with four balancing beams (11) having rollers (12) for gripping the wrapping in the first position and opening it in the second position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/135 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0092922 A2 19831102 - KARPISEK LADISLAV STEPHAN

Citation (search report)

[X] EP 0092922 A2 19831102 - KARPISEK LADISLAV STEPHAN

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060988 A1 20001220; EP 1060988 B1 20051207; DE 60024523 D1 20060112; DE 60024523 T2 20060817; DK 1060988 T3 20060418; ES 2254122 T3 20060616; FR 2794720 A1 20001215; FR 2794720 B1 20010831

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160510

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-11-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060908

2006-07-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20051207

2006-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2254122 T3

2006-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-04-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60024523 P 20060112

2005-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES GB IT NL

2005-12-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-12-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2003-04-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THIMON

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK ES GB IT NL

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010510

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES GB IT NL

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI