Global Patent Index - EP 1060996 A2

EP 1060996 A2 2000-12-20 - Box

Title (en)

Box

Title (de)

Kasten

Title (fr)

Coffre

Publication

EP 1060996 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111247 A

Priority

  • DE 29909745 U
  • DE 29910018 U
  • DE 29910475 U

Abstract (en)

A corner spar (3,4) is provided on the four corners of the crate and protrude into one side of it. The corner spars are interconnected by the upper edge (5,6) of the crate. A lower edge (17) interconnects the corner spars. Inside the crate there is a support upright (9) rising from the bottom (2) and upon which can rest the bottom of another crate stacked on top of it. The support uprights are each constructed as a hollow chamber divided internally by an intermediate partition (18).

Abstract (de)

Kasten(1,31,51,71) zum Einstellen und Transportieren von Flaschen(7), mit einem Boden(2,32,52,), Seitenwänden(3,4;33,34;53,54) und einem oberen Kastenrand(5,6;35,36;55,56), wobei an zwei einander gegenüberliegenden Seiten des Kastens(1,31,51,71) je eine weitgehend geschlossene Kastenwand(3,4) angeordnet ist, die über den oberen Kastenrand(5,6) miteinander verbunden sind; anstelle der weitgehend geschlossenen Kastenwände können auch lediglich vier Ecksäulen vorgesehen sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/243 (2013.01); B65D 2501/2407 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24095 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24222 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24254 (2013.01); B65D 2501/2428 (2013.01); B65D 2501/2435 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24522 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24541 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24585 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24598 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060996 A2 20001220; EP 1060996 A3 20070228

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091020

2009-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090409

2007-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070718

2007-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI