Global Patent Index - EP 1060998 A2

EP 1060998 A2 2000-12-20 - Tear-open folded box

Title (en)

Tear-open folded box

Title (de)

Aufreissbare Faltschachtel

Title (fr)

Boite pliante déchirable

Publication

EP 1060998 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305113 A

Priority

  • GB 9914314 A
  • GB 9915158 A

Abstract (en)

A container for the loading of shelves comprising a top (10), base (12), two sides (18, 20) and the two ends (14, 16) in which one end (14) is completely removable and the other end (16) partially or completely removable, so that when the container is to be emptied, one end (14) is removed, the container placed on a shelf with the open end towards the rear of the shelf, and the other end (16) is removed or partially removed, allowing the contents to be held while the container is pulled away from the contents, leaving them on the shelf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/32 (2006.01); B65D 5/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/5405 (2013.01); B65D 5/326 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060998 A2 20001220; EP 1060998 A3 20010110

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060418

2001-11-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): GB

2001-10-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010706

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65D 5/54 A, 7B 65D 5/32 B

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): GB

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI