Global Patent Index - EP 1061002 A1

EP 1061002 A1 2000-12-20 - Closing device for a container

Title (en)

Closing device for a container

Title (de)

Verschlussvorrichtung für ein Behältnis

Title (fr)

Système de bouchage pour un récipient

Publication

EP 1061002 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00109593 A

Priority

DE 19927980 A

Abstract (en)

Closure unit (10) comprises two sections and/or parts (12, 14) consisting respectively of hard and soft plastic materials.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Verschlußvorrichtung (10) für ein Behältnis, ein Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Verschlußvorrichtung sowie ein Verfahren zum Befüllen eines Behältnisses. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 51/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/241 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061002 A1 20001220; DE 19927980 A1 20001221; DE 19927980 B4 20070503; DE 19964544 B4 20090820

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030815

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020506

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010618

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI