Global Patent Index - EP 1061011 A1

EP 1061011 A1 2000-12-20 - Installation for concealable storage of receptacles

Title (en)

Installation for concealable storage of receptacles

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum versenkbaren Lagern von Behältern

Title (fr)

Installation pour le stockage escamotable de containeurs

Publication

EP 1061011 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420120 A

Priority

FR 9907886 A

Abstract (en)

An installation has a pneumatic actuator with coaxial telescopic tubes moving a platform vertically within a pit between two positions. In the lower position a container on the platform is completely hidden below ground. In the upper position the bottom of the container is at ground level. One end of each tube has an inflatable pad and a ring forming a seal with the adjacent tube. The ring is inflated by air or a fluid supplied independently of the fluid used to operate the actuator. The pad may be elastomeric.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/1457 (2013.01); B65F 1/1447 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061011 A1 20001220; FR 2795057 A1 20001222; FR 2795057 B1 20010817

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040415

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031203

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010419

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI