Global Patent Index - EP 1061022 A1

EP 1061022 A1 2000-12-20 - Device for delivering a stream of overlapping products

Title (en)

Device for delivering a stream of overlapping products

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Auslagern eines Schuppenstroms

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour délivrer un flux de produits se chevauchant

Publication

EP 1061022 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810541 A

Priority

EP 99810541 A

Abstract (en)

This installation has a winding trestle (19), a winding core (4) and two or more winding belt conveyors (5,6) on a belt conveyor magazine. One of the two belt conveyors can be pulled off from a roll (1), so that this belt conveyor strips printed items (3) from the roll. A deflection roller (7) runs the winding belt conveyor that has been pulled off. This belt conveyor takes on a stripping function and prevents the printed items being extricated from remaining stuck on the roll.

Abstract (de)

Die Einrichtung weist einen Wickelbock (19), einen Wickelkern (4) und wenigstens zwei auf ein Bandmagazin (11) aufwickelbare Wickelbänder (5, 6) auf. Eines der beiden Wickelbänder (5, 6) ist mit Mitteln (21) so weit vom Wickel (1) radial wegziehbar, dass dieses Wickelband (6) auslagernde Druckprodukte (3) vom Wickel (2) abstreift. Die genannten Mittel (21) weisen eine Umlenkrolle (7) auf, auf welcher das radial weggezogene Wickelband (6) umgelenkt wird. Das radial weggezogene Wickelband (6) übernimmt eine Abstreiffunktion und verhindert, dass auszulagernde Druckprodukte (3) am Wickel (1) haften bleiben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/28; B65H 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/28 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41922 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1932 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061022 A1 20001220; EP 1061022 B1 20040121; DE 59908369 D1 20040226

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120618

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59908369

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120618

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120618

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110629

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110711

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110614

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110616

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908369

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-01-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020918

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI