Global Patent Index - EP 1061023 A2

EP 1061023 A2 2000-12-20 - Suction head in a pneumatic pulling device

Title (en)

Suction head in a pneumatic pulling device

Title (de)

Sauger in pneumatischen Ziehmarken

Title (fr)

Tête de succion dans un dispositif pneumatique pour tirer

Publication

EP 1061023 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110755 A

Priority

DE 19928199 A

Abstract (en)

The suction device (3) for processing sheets in a printing machine is arranged in a housing (5) and is connected to a source of vacuum. There is a gap (10) between the surface of the device and the housing and it has cut-out sections through which the suction is applied.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Sauger in pneumatischen Ziehmarken zum Ziehen von Bogen in Druckmaschinen. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, einen Sauger für eine pneumatische Ziehmarke zu schaffen, der einen einfachen konstruktiven Aufbau aufweist und dessen Saugkraft ohne Vergrößerung der Saugerfläche vergrößert wird. Erfindungsgemäß wird diese Aufgabe dadurch gelöst, dass der Sauger (3) in einem Gehäuse (5) angeordnet ist, der Bogen einerseits über einen Sauganschluss (12) und eine Zentralbohrung (9) beaufschlagt wird und andererseits zwischen der Saugerfläche (15) des Saugers (3) und dem Gehäuse (5) ein Spalt (10) vorgesehen ist, der über die Aussparung (14) pneumatisch mit Saugluft beaufschlagbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 9/105 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061023 A2 20001220; EP 1061023 A3 20020626; EP 1061023 B1 20040428; DE 19928199 A1 20001221

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160607

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 97080 WUERZBURG, DE

- Document: DE 50006214

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110519

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110519

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110519

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100519

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100611

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-09-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040816

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006214 P 20040603

2004-06-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-03-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI