Global Patent Index - EP 1061122 A1

EP 1061122 A1 2000-12-20 - Aqueous pearlescent concentrates

Title (en)

Aqueous pearlescent concentrates

Title (de)

Wässrige Perlglanzkonzentrate

Title (fr)

Concentrés aqueux nacrés

Publication

EP 1061122 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112288 A

Priority

DE 19927653 A

Abstract (en)

Aqueous pearl glaze concentrate contains mixed ethers. Aqueous pearl glaze concentrate contains: (a) 1-99.9 wt.% mixed ethers of formula (I); (b) 0.1-99 wt.% anionic, non-ionic, ampholytic and/or zwitterionic emulsifiers and (c) optionally upto 40 wt.% polyols; Percentages are based on the concentrate and the remainder to 100% comprises water, adjuvants and additives. R<1> = upto 22C linear alkyl or alkenyl and R<2> = 12-22C linear alkyl or alkenyl (both substituted with OH); provided that R<1> and R<2> together contain at least 16C. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) preparation of the concentrate and (2) preparation of an opaque and pearl-glazed surface-active composition from the concentrate.

Abstract (de)

Es werden neue wäßrige Perlglanzkonzentrate vorgeschlagen, enthaltend - bezogen auf die Konzentrate - (a) 1 bis 99,9 Gew.-% Mischether der Formel (I), <IMAGE> in der R<1> für einen linearen Alkyl- und/oder Alkenylrest mit 1 bis 22 Kohlenstoffatomen und R<2> für einen hydroxysubstituierten linearen und/oder verzweigten Alkyl- und/oder Alkenylrest mit 12 bis 22 Kohlenstoffatomen steht, mit der Maßgabe, daß R<1> und R<2> in Summe mindestens 16 Kohlenstoffatome aufweisen, (b) 0,1 bis 99 Gew.-% anionische, nichtionische, kationische, ampholytische und/oder zwitterionische Emulgatoren sowie, (c) 0 bis 40 Gew.-% Polyole, mit der Maßgabe, daß sich die Mengenangaben mit Wasser und weiteren Hilfs- und Zusatzstoffen zu 100 Gew.-% ergänzen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/20; A61K 7/075; C11D 1/66; C11D 1/825; C11D 1/83; C11D 1/835; C11D 1/94

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/825 (2006.01); C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 1/835 (2006.01); C11D 1/94 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0089 (2013.01); C11D 1/66 (2013.01); C11D 1/825 (2013.01); C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 1/835 (2013.01); C11D 1/94 (2013.01); C11D 3/2041 (2013.01); C11D 3/2065 (2013.01); C11D 3/2068 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061122 A1 20001220; EP 1061122 B1 20040506; DE 19927653 A1 20001221; DE 19927653 C2 20021024; ES 2220297 T3 20041216

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130609

2014-07-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140707

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-17 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 50006305

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: C11D0003200000

- IPC: C11D0001660000

- Effective date: 20140307

2014-04-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50006305

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-07 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 50006305

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: C11D0003200000

- IPC: C11D0001660000

2014-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50006305

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120717

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120830

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050208

2005-04-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2220297 T3

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006305 P 20040609

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-05-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030403

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI