Global Patent Index - EP 1061124 A1

EP 1061124 A1 2000-12-20 - Method for preparing fragrance products

Title (en)

Method for preparing fragrance products

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Duftstoff enthaltenden Produkten

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la préparation de produits parfumés

Publication

EP 1061124 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00112230 A

Priority

US 13927899 P

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a process for reducing fragrance loss in a substrate. This process includes preparing a protected fragrance matrix that contains a perfume, an optional fixative and a solid absorbent. The process further includes combining a substrate conditioner with the fragrance matrix and a substrate. Products, especially fabric softener sheets, made from these processes are also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/50; C11D 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06M 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/50 (2006.01); D06M 11/77 (2006.01); D06M 13/02 (2006.01); D06M 15/53 (2006.01); C11D 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/047 (2013.01); C11D 3/001 (2013.01); C11D 3/505 (2013.01); C11D 17/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061124 A1 20001220; JP 2001032176 A 20010206

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031205

2003-11-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MCGEE, THOMAS

2003-11-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PURZYCKI, KENNETH LEO

2003-11-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SGARAMELLA, RICHARD P.

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010203

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI