Global Patent Index - EP 1061137 A3

EP 1061137 A3 2001-04-11 - Method and machine for automatically cutting hides

Title (en)

Method and machine for automatically cutting hides

Title (de)

Verfahren und Maschine zum automatischen Schneiden von Häuten

Title (fr)

Procédé et machine pour le découpage automatique des peaux

Publication

EP 1061137 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00111479 A

Priority

IT TO990494 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1061137A2] Method and machine for automatically cutting hides (2) according to which the hides (2) are fed automatically in sequence along a feed path (P) which extends through a mapping station (S2) in correspondence to which mapping and positioning devices (10, 12) outline the contour (11) of each hide /(2) and position within the contour of said hide, by means of a control unit (U), a determined number of shapes (13) which are to be cut within the contour (11) itself; the hide (2) is then fed through a cutting station (S3) so that the shapes (13) may be cut by a water jet cutting head (17). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C14B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/00 (2006.01); B26F 1/38 (2006.01); C14B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/007 (2013.01); B26D 5/00 (2013.01); B26D 5/005 (2013.01); B26D 5/34 (2013.01); B26F 1/3813 (2013.01); C14B 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061137 A2 20001220; EP 1061137 A3 20010411; IT 1308089 B1 20011129; IT TO990494 A1 20001211

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011012

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI