Global Patent Index - EP 1061144 A1

EP 1061144 A1 2000-12-20 - Method of preparing high purity gold from precious metal bearing nitrate solutions

Title (en)

Method of preparing high purity gold from precious metal bearing nitrate solutions

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Gold hoher Reinheit aus nitrathaltigen Edelmetall-Lösungen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour obtenir de l'or de pureté élevée à partir de solutions de nitrates des métaux précieux

Publication

EP 1061144 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00111133 A

Priority

DE 19928028 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19928028C1] High purity gold recovery from nitrate solution involves nitrate decomposition and gold recovery from the resulting highly acidic solution by ferric ion addition. High purity gold is recovered from nitrate-containing precious metal solution by: (a) nitrate decomposition to obtain a solution with \-4 mol/l H<+> ion concentration; and (b) gold ion reduction by addition of an acidic Fe<2+> solution having a \-4 mol/l H<+> ion concentration. Preferred Features: Step (a) is carried out using formic or ascorbic acid at 80-90 deg C, and step (b) is carried out under potential control at 60 deg C.

Abstract (de)

Es wird u. a. ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von Gold hoher Reinheit aus nitrathaltigen Edelmetall-Lösungen vorgestellt, mit folgenden Schritten: a) Nitratzerstörung in der Edelmetall-Lösung, b) eine Gold-Ionen-reduzierende Zugabe einer sauren Fe<2+>-Lösung, deren Konzentration an H<+>-Ionen mindestens 4 mol/l beträgt, zur in Schritt a) aufbereiteten Lösung, deren Konzentration an H<+>-Ionen mindestens 4 mol/l beträgt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22B 11/00; B22F 9/24; C22B 3/44; C22B 3/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22B 3/20 (2006.01); C22B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22B 11/04 (2013.01); C22B 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0073108 A1 19830302 - PERRIN ROBERT HENRY
  • [Y] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199339, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class E36, AN 1993-309447, XP002147907
  • [YA] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 200012, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M25, AN 2000-135514, XP002147908
  • [Y] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199801, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M25, AN 1998-004405, XP002147909

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19928028 C1 20000817; EP 1061144 A1 20001220; EP 1061144 B1 20031029; US 6331200 B1 20011218; ZA 200003019 B 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HERAEUS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS GMBH & CO. KG, 63450 HANAU, DE

- Document: DE 50004219

2015-06-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50004219

- Representative's name: KUEHN, HANS-CHRISTIAN, DE

2012-02-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HERAEUS MATERIALS TECHNOLOGY GMBH & CO. KG, 63450 HANAU, DE

- Document: DE 50004219

- Effective date: 20120109

2012-02-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: W.C. HERAEUS GMBH, 63450 HANAU, DE

- Document: DE 50004219

- Effective date: 20111219

2012-02-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HERAEUS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: W.C. HERAEUS GMBH, 63450 HANAU, DE

- Document: DE 50004219

- Effective date: 20111219

2012-02-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HERAEUS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HERAEUS MATERIALS TECHNOLOGY GMBH & CO. KG, 63450 HANAU, DE

- Document: DE 50004219

- Effective date: 20120109

2012-02-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50004219

- Representative's name: HANS-CHRISTIAN KUEHN, DE

- Effective date: 20111219

2012-02-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50004219

- Representative's name: HANS-CHRISTIAN KUEHN, DE

- Effective date: 20120109

2012-02-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50004219

- Representative's name: KUEHN, HANS-CHRISTIAN, DE

- Effective date: 20111219

2012-02-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50004219

- Representative's name: KUEHN, HANS-CHRISTIAN, DE

- Effective date: 20120109

2011-12-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50004219

- Representative's name: HANS-CHRISTIAN KUEHN, DE

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-04-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004219 P 20031204

2003-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020702

2001-10-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR LI

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000605

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI