Global Patent Index - EP 1061150 A3

EP 1061150 A3 2000-12-27 - Coating containing NiAl beta Phases

Title (en)

Coating containing NiAl beta Phases

Title (de)

NiAl-B-Phase enthaltende Beschichtung

Title (fr)

Revêtement comprenant des phases NiAl-beta

Publication

EP 1061150 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00810410 A

Priority

DE 19926669 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1061150A2] Layer contains Ni-Al- beta in the region of 20-90 vol.% with the following micro-alloying elements (in wt.%): 0.1-8 Fe and/or 0.1-8 Mo and/or 0.1-8 Ga. The total amount of Fe, Mo and Ga is maximum 10%.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 19/05; C23C 30/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 19/05 (2006.01); C23C 28/00 (2006.01); C23C 30/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 30/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19926669 A1 20001214; CN 1250771 C 20060412; CN 1280210 A 20010117; DE 50011352 D1 20060302; DE 50015301 D1 20080918; EP 1061150 A2 20001220; EP 1061150 A3 20001227; EP 1061150 B1 20051019; EP 1589122 A1 20051026; EP 1589122 B1 20080806; US 6471791 B1 20021029

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD, CH

- Effective date: 20161110

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 50011352

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011352

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-09-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060720

2006-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011352 P 20060302

2006-01-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051212

2005-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-10-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-07-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SCHWEIZ) AG

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010421

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI