Global Patent Index - EP 1061153 A1

EP 1061153 A1 2000-12-20 - Sliding part coated with triboactive oxides having a deficiency of metal cations

Title (en)

Sliding part coated with triboactive oxides having a deficiency of metal cations

Title (de)

Gleitteil beschichtet mit Metall-Kationarmen, triboaktiven Oxiden

Title (fr)

Pièce mécanique de friction recouverte d'oxydes triboactifs présentant un défaut de cations métalliques

Publication

EP 1061153 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401715 A

Priority

FR 9907630 A

Abstract (en)

The friction part is coated on part or on the whole of its surface with a layer comprising at least a metal oxide having a stoichiometric deficiency of metal cations and selected from Co1-yO, Cr2-yO, Fe3-yO4 and Mn1-yO, where y is greater than 0.00001 and less than 0.15. Preferably, y = 0.0001-0.01 for Co1-yO and Cr2-yO; y = 0.001-0.03 for Fe3-yO4; and y = 0.00001-0.1 for Mn1-yO. The metal oxide layer is preferably homogeneous and has thickness of 5-1000 microns , preferably 10-200 microns . The layer containing the metal oxide can comprise a metal or ceramic matrix of thickness 5-1000 microns , preferably 10-100 microns , and containing 5-70 weight %, preferably 10-40 weight %, tribo-active particles of at least one metal oxide having a deficiency of metal cations. Preferably, the tribo-active particles have mean size of 0.3-30 microns , more preferably 0.5-5 microns . Matrix metal is selected from iron, nickel, nickel-phosphorus, chromium, cobalt, tungsten, molybdenum, and alloy of these metals, iron-aluminum, brass (CuZn) or bronze (CuSn). Matrix ceramic is selected from Al2O3, ZrO2, Cr2O3, TiO2 or a mixture of these ceramics. Independent claims are given for: (a) a friction part concerning a cam following, a camshaft, a piston pin, a piston ring, a cylinder liner, a valve guide, a valve rod, a synchronizing cone, or an oil pump gear; and (b) production of the friction part by thermal spraying of powders of the components of the layer on the base of the friction part, or electroplating for composites having a metal matrix of nickel, nickel-phosphorus or chromium.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 4/10; C23C 4/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/06 (2006.01); C23C 4/10 (2006.01); C23C 30/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/06 (2013.01); C23C 4/11 (2016.01); C23C 30/00 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01); F05C 2203/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061153 A1 20001220; FR 2795095 A1 20001222; FR 2795095 B1 20020412

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-17 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040122

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

2001-12-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB

2001-12-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010608

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI