Global Patent Index - EP 1061162 B1

EP 1061162 B1 2002-09-18 - Process for the manufacture of a pure cashmere textile article

Title (en)

Process for the manufacture of a pure cashmere textile article

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines reinen Kaschmirtextilartikels

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un article textile pur cachemire

Publication

EP 1061162 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 00201095 A

Priority

IT MI991332 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1061162A1] Process for the manufacture of an article of pure cashmere, characterized in that it comprises the following sequence of steps: (a) association of first fibres of pure cashmere (1) with second fibres (2) of material dissolvable in slightly acid liquid solution at high temperature; (b) weaving of the obtained association; (c) dissolution of said second fibres by means of a slightly acid liquid solution at high temperature. Preferably said second fibres of material dissolvable in slightly acidic liquid solution at high temperature are made up of a synthetic yarn. In addition said association is, preferably, obtained by doubling a yarn (3) of pure cashmere with a yarn of synthetic fibre. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 3/02; D03D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/02 (2006.01); D02G 3/40 (2006.01); D03D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/406 (2013.01); D03D 15/00 (2013.01); D03D 15/06 (2013.01); D06Q 1/02 (2013.01); D10B 2211/02 (2013.01); D10B 2321/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061162 A1 20001220; EP 1061162 B1 20020918; EP 1061162 B2 20100210; AT 224470 T 20021015; DE 60000468 D1 20021024; DE 60000468 T2 20030807; DE 60000468 T3 20130103; ES 2181624 T3 20030301; ES 2181624 T5 20100517; IT 1312400 B1 20020417; IT MI991332 A1 20001215; IT MI991332 D0 19990615

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170315

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170314

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-06-30 [PGRI DE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Effective date: 20120928

2013-01-03 [REG DE R074] RE-ESTABLISHMENT ALLOWED

- Document: DE 60000468

- Effective date: 20120925

2013-01-03 [REG DE R074] RE-ESTABLISHMENT ALLOWED

- Document: DE 60000468

- Effective date: 20120928

2012-09-25 [REG DE R073] RE-ESTABLISHMENT REQUESTED

- Document: DE 60000468

2012-09-25 [REG DE R074] RE-ESTABLISHMENT ALLOWED

- Document: DE 60000468

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100511

2011-02-22 [REG DE R073] RE-ESTABLISHMENT REQUESTED

- Document: DE 60000468

2010-05-17 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2010-05-13 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20100400895

2010-02-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: MANTENIMENTO DEL BREVETTO IN FORMA MODIFICATA

2010-02-10 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20100210

2010-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2009-07-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CANEPA S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20030610

2009-07-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BISETA S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20030617

2009-07-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KURARAY CO., LTD.

- Effective date: 20030618

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GERALDINI, JACOPO

- Free text: GERALDINI, JACOPO#VIA VIVAIO, 4#20122 MILANO (IT) -TRANSFER TO- GERALDINI, JACOPO#VIA VIVAIO, 4#20122 MILANO (IT)

2004-01-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-08-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CANEPA S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-08-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ISA S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-08-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KURARAY CO., LTD.

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-08-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CANEPA S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-27 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-03-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-03-27 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181624 T3

2002-12-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020403822

2002-12-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-12-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000468 20021024

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224470 T 20021015

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI