Global Patent Index - EP 1061168 A1

EP 1061168 A1 2000-12-20 - A linear motor control device for driving knitting head components of a knitting machine

Title (en)

A linear motor control device for driving knitting head components of a knitting machine

Title (de)

Steuervorrichtung für einen Linearmotor zum Betrieb von Strickkomponenten einer Strickmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de controle d'un moteur lineaire pour l'entrainement des components de tricotage d'un métier à tricoter

Publication

EP 1061168 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00111968 A

Priority

JP 17035199 A

Abstract (en)

A drive control circuit (21), a driving circuit (22) and a pole position detector (22a) are combined together and connected to a knitting control unit (10). When a stop switch (SW2) is operated, for instance, the knitting control unit (10) causes the drive control circuit (21) and the driving circuit (22) to move a knitting head assembly (W) to its rearward movement limit and outputs a clear signal (S5). Upon receiving the clear signal (S5), the driving circuit (22) outputs a reset signal (S7) to the pole position detector (22a), so that relative position (y) of magnetic poles of a stator (M1) and the movable part (M2) detected by the pole position detector (22a) by using a sensor (A) is properly corrected. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/32; D04B 15/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/78 (2006.01); D04B 15/32 (2006.01); D04B 15/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/56 (2013.01); D04B 15/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061168 A1 20001220; EP 1061168 B1 20030205; DE 60001340 D1 20030313; JP 2001003245 A 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-02-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-06-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-01-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-05-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60001340

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2003-02-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-02-05 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030205

2003-02-05 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030205

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020607

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE GB IT LI

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010322

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI