Global Patent Index - EP 1061172 A2

EP 1061172 A2 2000-12-20 - Synthetic fibre rope for use with a traction sheave

Title (en)

Synthetic fibre rope for use with a traction sheave

Title (de)

Kunstfaserseil zum Antrieb durch eine Seilscheibe.

Title (fr)

Câble en fibres synthétiques destiné à être utilisé avec une poulie d'entraînement

Publication

EP 1061172 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111777 A

Priority

  • EP 00111777 A
  • EP 99810512 A

Abstract (en)

A synthetic fiber lifting cable consists of two parallel strands (14,15) of opposite twist direction (S,Z) held at some distance (19) in a common sheath (17). Layers of component yarns (21 to 28) are arranged to have twist directions opposite to each other and opposite to the corresponding yarn in the other strand so as to give a completely symmetrical structure.

Abstract (de)

Ein Kunstfaserseil zum Antrieb durch eine Seilscheibe, ist als Zwillingsseil (3) aus zwei in entgegengesetzten Drehrichtungen (S,Z) verseilten Seilen (14,15) aufgebaut, die verdrehfest und in ihrer parallelen, beabstandeten Lage zueinander durch einen gemeinsamen Seilmantel (17) fixiert sind. Der erfindungsgemäss über beide Seile (14,15) ausgebildete Seilmantel (17) wirkt als Drehmomentenstütze, die unter Längsbelastung des Zwillingsseils (3), durch den Seilaufbau bedingt entstehende, entgegengesetzt orientierte Drehmomente der Seile (14,15) gegenseitig aufhebt und damit über den Gesamtquerschnitt des Zwillingsseils (3) einen Drehmomentenausgleich zwischen der Summe aller rechts- und aller linksgängigen Litzenanteile schafft. Das Zwillingsseil (3) verhält sich beim Lauf über eine Seilscheibe drehungsfrei. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D07B 1/22; D07B 1/02; D07B 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D07B 1/04 (2006.01); D07B 1/00 (2006.01); D07B 1/02 (2006.01); D07B 1/16 (2006.01); D07B 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D07B 1/22 (2013.01); B66B 7/062 (2013.01); D07B 1/025 (2013.01); D07B 1/162 (2013.01); D07B 2201/1008 (2013.01); D07B 2205/205 (2013.01); D07B 2401/2015 (2013.01); D07B 2501/2007 (2013.01); D10B 2331/021 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

D07B 2205/205 + D07B 2801/10

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6508051 B1 20030121; AR 024321 A1 20020925; AT 267287 T 20040615; AU 3940900 A 20001214; AU 765731 B2 20030925; BR 0002617 A 20010109; BR 0002617 B1 20101228; CA 2311207 A1 20001211; CA 2311207 C 20070410; CN 1130487 C 20031210; CN 1277281 A 20001220; DE 50006459 D1 20040624; DK 1061172 T3 20040809; EP 1061172 A2 20001220; EP 1061172 A3 20010110; EP 1061172 B1 20040519; ES 2220295 T3 20041216; HK 1034547 A1 20050121; IL 136332 A 20050619; IL 136332 D0 20010520; JP 2000355888 A 20001226; JP 4748832 B2 20110817; KR 100656726 B1 20061215; KR 20010049493 A 20010615; NO 20002983 A 20001212; NO 20002983 D0 20000609; NO 316277 B1 20040105; PT 1061172 E 20041029; SG 106581 A1 20041029; TR 200001697 A2 20010122; TR 200001697 A3 20010122; ZA 200002574 B 20001201

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160602

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-01-21 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1034547

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2220295 T3

2004-10-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-08-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-08-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-08-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040727

2004-08-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006459 P 20040624

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-06-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-05-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-19 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-05-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040519

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020923

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI