Global Patent Index - EP 1061174 A3

EP 1061174 A3 2001-03-21 - Headbox

Title (en)

Headbox

Title (de)

Stoffauflauf

Title (fr)

Caisse de tête

Publication

EP 1061174 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00107661 A

Priority

DE 19926804 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1061174A2] The stock inlet, for a papermaking or cardboard prodn. machine, has a number of channels arranged in rows and columns across the machine width, with at least one flexible blade (7a) between rows. Blade supports (6a,6b) for the blades (7a) are after the blade clamping points (10a), in the suspension flow direction. The blade supports (6a,6b) are at the webs between two neighboring horizontal rows of channels, with at least three supports (6a,6b) across the width of the stock inlet. The blade supports (6a,6b) have a curvature at their zones (8) facing the blades (7a), with an identical curvature at the zones (9) away from the blades. The blades (7a) are totally supported (6a,6b) at the initial zone from the clamping points (10a), in the flow direction. All the blade supports (6a,6b) have the same curvature, or the supports for one row of channels have a greater curvature than those for the lower row of channels. The blade supports (6a,6b) are in one piece with the webs, or they are mounted to the webs. Blade supports (6a,6b) are fitted to the webs where there are blank spaces, to maintain the suspension flow conditions. The blades (7a) are at a vertical gap of 2 mm from their supports (6a,6b) at the clamping points.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2013.01); D21F 1/026 (2013.01); D21F 1/028 (2013.01); Y10T 29/302 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49032 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49826 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] US 5013406 A 19910507 - HERGERT RICHARD R [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19926804 A1 20001214; EP 1061174 A2 20001220; EP 1061174 A3 20010321; US 2003005565 A1 20030109; US 6471828 B1 20021029; US 6602388 B2 20030805

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051001

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI