Global Patent Index - EP 1061188 A1

EP 1061188 A1 2000-12-20 - Drain- and waterflow fitting with a water supply for a bath tub

Title (en)

Drain- and waterflow fitting with a water supply for a bath tub

Title (de)

Ab- und Überlaufarmatur mit einem Wasserzulauf für eine Badewanne

Title (fr)

Armature de décharge et de trop-plein avec alimentation d'eau pour une baignoire

Publication

EP 1061188 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00109940 A

Priority

DE 29910430 U

Abstract (en)

The inflow section has a ring-shaped protrusion acting as a slide bearing for supporting it on top of the central connection in the overflow section (2) for receiving the actuator shaft operating the outflow valve (5). A screw is passed through the ring to secure the inflow section to the connection. The overflow section located on the outside of the bathtub (6) includes a central connection for receiving an actuator shaft from a rose for a Bowden cable connected to an outflow valve (5). The inflow section is connected to the overflow section and supported against the inside wall of the bathtub via a seal.

Abstract (de)

Eine Ab- und Überlaufarmatur mit einem Wasserzulauf für eine Badewanne mit an der Wannenaußenseite angeordnetem Überlaufkörper, der sich teilweise durch eine Öffnung in der zugeordneten Wannenwand in den Innenraum der Wanne erstreckt, weist einen mittigen Stutzen zur Aufnahme einer von einer Rosette ausgehenden Betätigungswelle für einen zu einem Ablaufventil führenden Bowdenzug auf. Der Überlaufkörper (2) ist mit einem Zulaufteil (3) verbunden, das sich über eine Dichtung (10) an der Innenfläche der Wannenwand abstützt. Das Zulaufteil (3) ist dabei auf den mittigen Stutzen (13) des Überlaufkörpers (2) mit einem ringförmigen Vorsprung gleitbar gelagert und durch eine durch den Vorsprung geführte Schraube (10) am Stutzen (13) festlegbar. Vorzugsweise ist der mittige Vorsprung (14) im Außendurchmesser gestuft ausgebildet. Durch diese Ausbildung der Ab- und Überlaufarmatur wird die Montage und die konstruktive Ausbildung des Zulaufteiles vereinfacht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/232

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/232 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/232 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29910430 U1 19990805; AT 254222 T 20031115; EP 1061188 A1 20001220; EP 1061188 B1 20031112

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160511

2017-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 254222 T

- Effective date: 20160511

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004401 P 20031218

2003-11-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MWP MARTIN, WEBER & PARTNER

2003-11-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI NL

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE IT LI NL

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001205

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI NL

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI