Global patent index - EP 1061194 A2

EP 1061194 A2 2000-12-20 - Glass pane holding device

Title (en)

Glass pane holding device

Title (de)

Haltevorrichtung für Glasscheiben

Title (fr)

Dispositif de retenue de panneaux de verre

Publication

EP 1061194 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106477 A

Priority

DE 29910537 U

Abstract (en)

A profiled strip is used as the clamping profile (31) engaging with the two panels or panes (3, 4). The strip is clamped against the spacer element (21) between the two panels or panes via two seals (24, 25) to form a layer construction. The mounting (1) comprises a basis profile (11) containing a screw channel (14) in a protruding seat section (13), joined to which is a hollow profile acting as a spacer element. A clamping profile covers both sides of the spacer element. Seals (16, 17) are pressed between the clamping and basis profiles.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Vorrichtung (1) zur Halterung von zwei Glasscheiben (3, 4) an Pfosten (2) einer Fassade (10), bestehend aus einem an diesem zu befestigenden Grundprofil (11), einem mit diesem verbundenen Abstandshalter (21) sowie einem diesen beidseits übergreifenden Klemmprofil (31), zwischen dem und dem Grundprofil (11) die Glasscheiben (3, 4) über an diesen anliegenden Dichtungen (16, 17 bzw. 24, 25) eingespannt sind, ist das Klemmprofil (31) als profilierte Leiste ausgebildet und über die diesem zugeordneten Dichtungen (24, 25) in den Abstandhalter (21) lageorientiert eingesetzt. Durch diese Ausgestaltung wird erreicht, daß eine Fassade (10) in kurzer Zeit problemlos zu montieren ist und daß stets eine zuverlässige Abdichtung auf deren Außenseite gewährleistet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/96 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/967 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29910537 U1 19990930; EP 1061194 A2 20001220; EP 1061194 A3 20010808

INPADOC legal status

2003-02-05 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-06-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-05-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2002-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH LI

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020202

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH LI

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI