Global Patent Index - EP 1061198 A3

EP 1061198 A3 2000-12-27 - A window for installation in a roof structure and a mounting bracket for use in the installation

Title (en)

A window for installation in a roof structure and a mounting bracket for use in the installation

Title (de)

Ein Fenster für den Einbau in eine Dachstruktur und eine dazugehörige Halterung

Title (fr)

Fenêtre se montant dans une structure de toit et support de fixation s'utilisant pour le montage

Publication

EP 1061198 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00610058 A

Priority

DK PA199900868 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1061198A2] The invention provides a window (1) comprising a frame with a number of frame members (2) and mounting brackets (7). Each mounting bracket has a first leg (7b) to be connected with the exterior side of a frame member and a second leg (7a) substantially perpendicular to and connected with the first leg in a connection point (7c). The exterior side of the frame members is provided with a longitudinal marking (16) extending in the longitudinal direction of the frame member, and the mounting brackets have at least one marking for cooperating with the longitudinal marking (16) of the frame member. The markings may be made as a graduated scale in the form of a millimetre graduation, a graduation in another unit or a symbol system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/03; E04B 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/56 (2006.01); E04D 13/03 (2006.01); E06B 1/32 (2006.01); E06B 3/00 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/031 (2013.01); E04B 2001/405 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061198 A2 20001220; EP 1061198 A3 20001227; EP 1061198 B1 20030903; AT 248967 T 20030915; AT 312249 T 20051215; CN 1280235 A 20010117; CZ 20002280 A3 20010214; CZ 302511 B6 20110629; DE 60004927 D1 20031009; DE 60004927 T2 20040722; DE 60024689 D1 20060112; DE 60024689 T2 20060810; EP 1380706 A1 20040114; EP 1380706 B1 20051207; ES 2206168 T3 20040516; ES 2253634 T3 20060601; HR P20000399 A2 20010630; HR PK20000399 B1 20021231; PT 1061198 E 20040227; RU 2184198 C2 20020627; SK 286507 B6 20081205; SK 9262000 A3 20010118; YU 38500 A 20030131

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170614

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170511

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170606

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160609

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160609

2017-05-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160609

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160513

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150609

2016-05-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150609

2016-03-23 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 248967 T

- Effective date: 20150609

2016-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150603

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150512

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-06-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140528

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140612

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2014-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20140610

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-05-03 [REG DE R040] WITHDRAWAL/REFUSAL OF REVOCATION ACTION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 60004927

- Effective date: 20110215

2011-02-15 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60004927

2009-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090107

2009-04-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20090219

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081209

2008-12-22 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20081209

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VKR HOLDING A/S

- Free text: VKR HOLDING A/S#BREELTEVEJ 18#2970HORSHOLM (DK) -TRANSFER TO- VKR HOLDING A/S#BREELTEVEJ 18#2970HORSHOLM (DK)

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20070606

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-09-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VKR HOLDING A/S

- Free text: VKR HOLDING A/S#TOBAKSVEJEN 10#2860 SOEBORG (DK) -TRANSFER TO- VKR HOLDING A/S#BREELTEVEJ 18#2970 HOERSHOLM (DK)

2007-06-05 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070605

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2206168 T3

2004-02-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2003-12-22 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030404887

2003-12-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-10-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60004927 P 20031009

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-09-03 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-09-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04D 13/03 A, 7E 04B 1/26 B

2002-06-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: A WINDOW FOR INSTALLATION IN A ROOF STRUCTURE AND THE USE OF A MOUNTING BRACKET FOR INSTALLATION

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010504;LT PAYMENT 20010504;LV PAYMENT 20010504;MK PAYMENT 20010504;RO PAYMENT 20010504;SI PAYMENT 20010504

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010504

2001-05-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VKR HOLDING A/S

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04D 13/03 A, 7E 04B 1/26 B

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI