Global Patent Index - EP 1061200 A2

EP 1061200 A2 2000-12-20 - Set of woodwork mounting pieces without the use of special tooling for the self-production of a wall cladding surface

Title (en)

Set of woodwork mounting pieces without the use of special tooling for the self-production of a wall cladding surface

Title (de)

Bausatz von Tischlerbestandteilen zum Selbstherstellen von einer Wandverkleidungsoberfläche ohne Spezialwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Ensemble de pièces de menuiserie soi-même sans outils spéciaux pour la réalisation d'une surface d'habillage de mur

Publication

EP 1061200 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00470009 A

Priority

FR 9907799 A

Abstract (en)

Wall covering comprises set of panels (16), top and bottom fixing parts and wall coupling parts for fixings. There are lateral panel holding parts and caps. Each panel is held in floating manner parallel to wall by two longitudinal fixing parts. These are bottom fixing part (15,53) connected to wall in removable manner by coupling (12,14,12',14'). Top fixing part (53,41) is removably connected to wall by fitting (20,20'). An Independent claim is also included for the set of parts used for making wall coverings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 13/10; E04F 19/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/10 (2006.01); E04F 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 19/06 (2013.01); E04F 13/10 (2013.01); E04F 19/064 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061200 A2 20001220; EP 1061200 A3 20011004; FR 2795113 A1 20001222; FR 2795113 B1 20010817

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080103

2005-07-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BEGUE, DANIEL

2001-07-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BEGUE, ELISABETH

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI