Global Patent Index - EP 1061202 A1

EP 1061202 A1 2000-12-20 - Method for laying a panel-shaped covering on a support

Title (en)

Method for laying a panel-shaped covering on a support

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Verlegen einer plattenförmigen Beschichtung auf einem Träger

Title (fr)

Procédé de pose sur un support d'un revêtement sous forme de plaques

Publication

EP 1061202 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401553 A

Priority

FR 9907681 A

Abstract (en)

Covering which comprises a set of juxtaposed facing tiles (32) are placed on a support (30) covered with a bituminous sheet (10). The bituminous sheet is applied at ambient temperature without heating on the support. This is followed by and application and connection stage of the tiles along a reception surface. The laid tiles are then heated on their exposed surface with a gas burner flame (34).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 15/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/18 (2013.01); E04F 15/182 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0463933 A1 19920102 - SIPLAST SA [FR]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 389 (M - 1642) 21 July 1994 (1994-07-21)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061202 A1 20001220; EP 1061202 B1 20060412; DE 60027222 D1 20060524; DE 60027222 T2 20070104; FR 2795114 A1 20001222; FR 2795114 B1 20030328

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160301

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60027222

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140507

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070115

2006-07-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060723

2006-07-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2006-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060516

2006-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60027222 P 20060524

2006-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB SE

2006-04-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AXTER

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040908

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010123

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI