Global Patent Index - EP 1061203 A2

EP 1061203 A2 2000-12-20 - Standard element for a scaffolding

Title (en)

Standard element for a scaffolding

Title (de)

Mastelement für ein Gerüst

Title (fr)

Elément de montant pour un échafaudage

Publication

EP 1061203 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109013 A

Priority

DE 19927158 A

Abstract (en)

The mast element (1) can be connected to more mast elements to make a mast (14) for a scaffolding (17) comprising several masts. The mast elements can be plug and together and rotated through at least 20 degrees and up to 360 degrees to connect them. The total length of the mast can be held constant by rotating the mast elements that have been connected. An Independent claim is included for a scaffolding including at least one mast constructed from the mast elements.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Mastelement (1), insbesondere für ein Gerüst mit als Laststützen dienenden Masten (14). Bei einem Gerüst, welches zumindest einen, aus mehreren lösbar miteinander verbundenen Mastelementen (1) bestehenden, Mast (14) aufweist, wird die lösbare Verbindung der Mastelemente miteinander durch Zusammenstecken und Verdrehen der Mastelemente (1) gegeneinander bewirkt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 1/12; E04G 11/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 1/12 (2006.01); E04G 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 1/12 (2013.01); E04G 7/301 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19820772 A1 19991111 - THYSSEN HUENNEBECK GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK FR SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061203 A2 20001220; EP 1061203 A3 20010314; EP 1061203 B1 20041013; AT 279616 T 20041015; DE 19927158 A1 20001221; DK 1061203 T3 20050207

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120427

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008190

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120426

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 279616 T

- Effective date: 20120426

2012-12-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-11-19 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2011-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110408

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110401

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110504

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110427

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110425

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-07-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-02-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008190 P 20041118

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FR SE

2004-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HUENNEBECK GMBH

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE DK FR SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010326

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04G 1/12 A, 7E 04G 11/48 B, 7E 04G 7/30 B, 7E 04H 12/18 B, 7E 04H 12/10 B

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FR SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI