Global Patent Index - EP 1061205 A1

EP 1061205 A1 2000-12-20 - Mortar syringe

Title (en)

Mortar syringe

Title (de)

Mörtelspritze

Title (fr)

Seringue à mortier

Publication

EP 1061205 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00111601 A

Priority

  • DE 29910275 U
  • DE 29916603 U

Abstract (en)

The mortar syringe (10) has a tube (12) with a smooth inner surface and a nozzle (14) at one end. A piston (18) slides freely in the tube and is controlled by a piston rod (30), whose free end has a handle (34). The end of the tube opposite the nozzle has a removable closure cap (38) with a pressure balancing opening and an opening through which the piston rod passes. The cap may be closed by screwing, by a bayonet closure or by a clamp device. An Independent claim is included for a method to apply mortar using the mortar syringe.

Abstract (de)

Eine Mörtelspritze (10) besteht aus einem Rohr (12) mit glatter Innenfläche, einer an einem Ende des Rohrs (10) angebrachten Düse (14) und einem im Inneren des Rohrs (12) frei verschiebbaren Kolben (18). Dieser ist an einer in das Rohr (10) hineinragenden Kolbenstange (20) angebracht. Deren freies Ende ist mit einem Griff (34) versehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 23/02; B05C 17/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/01 (2006.01); E04F 21/165 (2006.01); E04G 23/02 (2006.01); B05C 17/005 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 23/0203 (2013.01); E04G 23/0211 (2013.01); B05C 17/01 (2013.01); E04F 21/165 (2013.01); B05C 17/00576 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061205 A1 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041129

2003-07-30 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: KAIM, UWE

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAIM, UWE

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030210

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI