Global Patent Index - EP 1061206 A2

EP 1061206 A2 2000-12-20 - Self-supporting self-standing structure

Title (en)

Self-supporting self-standing structure

Title (de)

Selbsttragende und formstabile Struktur

Title (fr)

Structure autoporteuse et autostable

Publication

EP 1061206 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305080 A

Priority

GB 9914098 A

Abstract (en)

A self-supporting structure (100) comprising first and second resilient loops (110 and 120) intersecting with each other at two positions (A and B). Each of the loops (110 and 120) is self-expanding by virtue of its resilience. The structure (100) includes flexible panels (140 to 170) extending across the loops (110 and 120) for stretching to limit the extent to which the loops (110 and 120) expand in space into a self-standing expanded configuration for use. The loops (110 and 120) are capable of being pivoted to lie substantially flat with each other and then coiled into a plurality of much smaller turns into a collapsed configuration for storage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 15/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/40 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061206 A2 20001220; EP 1061206 A3 20020123; AU 4090900 A 20001221; GB 2351093 A 20001220; GB 9914098 D0 19990818

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-11-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YU, TERESA

2001-01-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YU, KING WAY SIDNEY

2001-01-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SU, SHI WEI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI