Global Patent Index - EP 1061212 A2

EP 1061212 A2 2000-12-20 - Actuator with an electro motor for motor vehicle locks

Title (en)

Actuator with an electro motor for motor vehicle locks

Title (de)

Elektromotorischer Stellantrieb für ein Kraftfahrzeugschloss

Title (fr)

Actionneur à moteur électrique pour des serrures de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1061212 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112115 A

Priority

DE 19927842 A

Abstract (en)

The electric motor setting drive has an electric motor (1) coupled to a driven setting element (4) for operation of a switch element (5) for switching the lock mechanism between its different locking states. The setting element is associated with a movable blocking element (10) cooperating with a blocking stop (11) of a force transfer element (9) provided by the setting element, for blocking the movement of the setting element and disconnection of the setting motor, with release of the blocking element upon motor disconnection.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein elektromotorischer Stellantrieb für ein Kraftfahrzeugschloß, wobei das Kraftfahrzeugschloß eine Schloßmechanik aufweist, die in verschiedene Funktionszustände schaltbar ist, mit einem Antriebsmotor (1), einem vom Antriebsmotor (1) nicht selbsthemmend angetriebenen Stellelement (4) und einem von dem Stellelement (4) angetriebenen Schaltelement zum Schalten der Schloßmechanik in die verschiedenen Funktionszustände. Dieser ist nun dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß an dem Stellelement (4) ein zusätzliches Kraftübertragungselement (9) angeordnet ist, daß dem Stellelement (4) ein bewegliches Sperrelement (10) zugeordnet ist, das einen Sperranschlag (11) für das Kraftübertragungselement (9) aufweist, daß das Kraftübertragungselement (9) des sich bewegenden Stellelementes (4) auf den Sperranschlag (11) des Sperrelementes (10) trifft, die Bewegung des Stellelementes (4) dadurch blockiert und der Antriebsmotor (1) dadurch abgeschaltet wird und daß nach durch das Abschalten des Antriebsmotors (1) bewirkter Entspannung des Antriebszuges der Sperranschlag (11) des Sperrelements (10) die Bewegungsbahn des Kraftübertragungselementes (9) verläßt. Damit wird ein "fliegender" Anschlag realisiert, durch den ein Abschalten des Antriebsmotors (1) im Block möglich wird, der danach einfach wieder "verschwindet". <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/12; E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/24 (2014.01); E05B 81/34 (2014.01); E05B 77/24 (2014.01); E05B 81/06 (2014.01); E05B 81/62 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/25 (2013.01); E05B 81/34 (2013.01); E05B 77/24 (2013.01); E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 81/62 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061212 A2 20001220; EP 1061212 A3 20011010; EP 1061212 B1 20031217; DE 19927842 A1 20010104; ES 2212941 T3 20040816

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140607

2015-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150729

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140606

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140606

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50004765

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140101

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130614

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130605

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50004765

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GOTTSCHALD PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI, DE

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-09-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2212941

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-03-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50004765

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BROSE SCHLIESSSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020410

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI