Global Patent Index - EP 1061217 A2

EP 1061217 A2 2000-12-20 - Plate with engagement selvages for bolts of casements, such as doors and windows

Title (en)

Plate with engagement selvages for bolts of casements, such as doors and windows

Title (de)

Schliessblech mit Kontaktkanten für Treibstangenschloss für Türen und Fenster

Title (fr)

Gâche avec lisières de contact pour crémone-serrures pour portes et fenêtres

Publication

EP 1061217 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00111907 A

Priority

IT BO990079 U

Abstract (en)

A plate with engagement selvages for the bolts of leaves of doors and windows, said plate (1) being mountable in a channel (9) of profiles which form rails of a frame of a door or window, said channel being formed by two parallel ridges (9a) which form said channel and from the top of which two lips (9b) protrude toward each other, said lips forming two undercuts, the plate comprising two sliding blocks (16, 17) which can be arranged along said channel, two lateral selvages (2, 3) being arranged to the sides of a central selvage (4) of said plate, said lateral selvages (2, 3) being meant for the engagement of a bolt of a fixed leaf and said central selvage (4) being designed for the engagement of a bolt of a movable leaf of said door or window, two slots (7, 8) being formed at the ends of said plate, said slots being perpendicular to said channel and acting as a guide for said sliding blocks transversely to said channel, said slots (7, 8) being crossed by two screws (10) for fixing said plate (1) along said channel (9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/02 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/1808 (2013.01); E05B 15/024 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

IT BO990079 A1 20000824 - BIESSE SPA [IT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061217 A2 20001220; EP 1061217 A3 20010425; IT 247473 Y1 20020822; IT BO990079 U1 20001218

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011026

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 05C 9/18 A, 7E 05B 15/02 B

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI