Global patent index - EP 1061220 A2

EP 1061220 A2 2000-12-20 - Hinge for doors, windows or the like

Title (en)

Hinge for doors, windows or the like

Title (de)

Band für Türen, Fenster oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Charnière pour portes, fenêtres ou similaires

Publication

EP 1061220 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110694 A

Priority

DE 29910265 U

Abstract (en)

Flap (100) has a flap part (10) with several components (2, 2'). Hinge parts (1, 1') of one of the flap parts are arranged on separate components. The components interlock with the facing front sides (4, 4') of their hinge parts.

Abstract (de)

Das Band (100) für Türen, Fenster oder dergleichen umfaßt einen an dem feststehenden Rahmen der Tür, des Fensters oder dergleichen zu befestigenden Rahmenbandteil (10) und einen an dem Flügel der Tür, des Fensters oder dergleichen zu befestigenden Flügelbandteil (20). Zumindest der Rahmenbandteil (10) weist zwei Scharnierteile (1, 1') auf, die jeweils mit einer Stirnseite (4, 4') an eine der beiden Stirnseiten (6, 6') eines Scharnierteils (5) des anderen Bandteils (20) angrenzen. Die beiden Scharnierteile (1, 1') des Rahmenbandteils (10) sind auf separaten Bestandteilen (2, 2') dieses Bandteils (10) angeordnet und kraftschlüssig mit den einander zugewandten Stirnseiten (4, 4') ihrer Scharnierteile (1, 1') voneinander beabstandet miteinander verbunden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/04 (2006.01); E05D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/04 (2013.01); E05D 9/00 (2013.01); E05D 2003/025 (2013.01); E05D 2003/027 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/626 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19739930 A1 19980326 - PARYS REMI E VAN [BE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29910265 U1 20001102; EP 1061220 A2 20001220; EP 1061220 A3 20041027

INPADOC legal status

2006-02-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050428

2005-08-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2005-07-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2004-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI