Global patent index - EP 1061227 A2

EP 1061227 A2 2000-12-20 - Sealing arrangement for the gap between a prefabricated surround frame and a shuttering element

Title (en)

Sealing arrangement for the gap between a prefabricated surround frame and a shuttering element

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Abdichtung des Zwischenraumes zwischen einem vorgefertigten Leibungsrahmen und einem Schalungselement

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'étanchéification de l'interstice entre un encadrement de baie préfabriqué et un élément de coffrage

Publication

EP 1061227 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106947 A

Priority

DE 19926974 A

Abstract (en)

The device has at least one sealing element (6), which forms a sealing frame in the intermediate space and which is anchored to the frame (1'). The sealing element is arranged so that it forms a closure or a long-lasting sealing element, e.g. a plastering edge, after the concrete part has set. The sealing element may alternatively be removable and replacable with a profile piece that forms a decorative or locking element.

Abstract (de)

Es ist eine Vorrichtung zur Abdichtung des Zwischenraumes zwischen einem vorgefertigten Leibungsrahmen und einem Schalungselement für aus Beton herzustellende Bauteile und/oder Mauerabschnitte offenbart, wobei der Leibungsrahmen mit einem Dichtungselement ausgestattet ist, um den genannten Zwischenraum abzudichten. Das Dichtungselement ist derart ausgebildet und angeordnet, daß es nicht nur die Dichtungsfunktion an sich, sondern auch noch weitere Funktionen übernehmen kann wie beispielsweise eine Anputzkante bildet, durch die der Anputzvorgang besonders einfach und schnell vorgenommen werden kann. Das Dichtungselement ist in bevorzugter Weise so angeordnet, daß es in dem herzustellenden Betonteil zumindest teilweise verankert wird oder durch ein Profilteil ersetzt werden kann, welches ebenfalls eine exakt verlaufende Anputzkante formt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/24; E06B 1/62; E06B 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/24 (2006.01); E06B 1/62 (2006.01); E06B 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/24 (2013.01); E06B 1/62 (2013.01); E06B 5/08 (2013.01); E06B 2001/622 (2013.01); E06B 2001/624 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4320673 A1 19950105 - AHLMANN ACO SEVERIN [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061227 A2 20001220; EP 1061227 A3 20020116; DE 19926974 A1 20010104

INPADOC legal status

2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031001

2002-10-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020219

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 06B 1/24 A, 7E 06B 1/62 B, 7E 06B 5/08 B, 7E 04G 15/02 B

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI