Global Patent Index - EP 1061228 A2

EP 1061228 A2 2000-12-20 - Insulating and/or reinforcing profile member and window,door or fixed glazing provided with this profile member

Title (en)

Insulating and/or reinforcing profile member and window,door or fixed glazing provided with this profile member

Title (de)

Dämm- und/oder Armierungsprofil sowie Fenster, Tür oder Festverglasung mit diesem Profil

Title (fr)

Profilé isolant et/ou renforçant ainsi que fenêtre, porte ou vitrage fixe pourvue de ce profilé

Publication

EP 1061228 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111359 A

Priority

CH 114499 A

Abstract (en)

The profile is made of a thin-walled stainless or chromium steel plate with a wall thickness less than 0.5 mm, but preferably between 0.09 mm and 0.25 mm. The profile is preferably formed as a polygonal closed hollow profile, to improve its resistance to torsion. Longitudinal or transverse ribs or flanges may be formed in the profile, to improve stiffness. Independent claims are included for a window or door or for a glazed panel with the profile.

Abstract (de)

Das aus Edelstahl bestehende Dämm- und/oder Armierungsprofil (12, 13) ist vorzugsweise als Hohlprofil mit einer Wandstärke von 0.09 - 0.25 mm ausgebildet, wobei sowohl dessen Ausschäumung als auch eine dessen statische Festigkeit erhöhende Formgebung möglich ist. Es kann u.a. zur thermischen Trennung in einem Metall-Fenster zwischen einem Aussenprofil (14, 15) und einem Innenprofil (16, 17) des Flügels (4) und des Rahmens (10) angeordnet werden. Weiter kann es in den Hohlräumen eines Kunststoffensters zu dessen statischen Versteifung dienen oder zu Dämmungszwecken in Festverglasungen verwendet werden. Das im Flügel (4) anzuordnende Dämm- und/oder Armierungsprofil (12) kann zudem mit einer Ausformung versehen sein, die als Abstandshalter zwischen den Glasscheiben einer Mehrfachverglasung dient. Dank der geringen Wärmeleitung des Edelstahls und der sehr geringen Wandstärke weist dieses Dämm- und/oder Armierungsprofil (12, 13) einen guten K-Wert von 0.35 W./m<2> auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/263; E06B 3/16; E06B 3/22; E06B 3/24; E06B 3/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/16 (2006.01); E06B 3/22 (2006.01); E06B 3/24 (2006.01); E06B 3/54 (2006.01); E06B 3/263 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/163 (2013.01); E06B 3/16 (2013.01); E06B 3/222 (2013.01); E06B 3/24 (2013.01); E06B 3/5427 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26352 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26376 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061228 A2 20001220; EP 1061228 A3 20020102

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-10-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI