Global Patent Index - EP 1061230 A1

EP 1061230 A1 2000-12-20 - Metal ladder for scaffolding with crimped connection between rungs and stile

Title (en)

Metal ladder for scaffolding with crimped connection between rungs and stile

Title (de)

Gerüstmetallleiter mit eingefasster Sprossen-Holme Verbindung

Title (fr)

Echelle d'échafaudage métallique à échelons sertis sur les montants

Publication

EP 1061230 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401613 A

Priority

FR 9907616 A

Abstract (en)

The scaffolding ladder has rounded section tubular rungs (13) and uprights (1). The ends (11) of the rungs (3) are oval over a length slightly greater than the width of the uprights. They are each fitted into a complementary drilled hole in each of the uprights and crimped (7) on the outside of the upright.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06C 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06C 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06C 7/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061230 A1 20001220; EP 1061230 B1 20050817; AT 302328 T 20050915; DE 60021957 D1 20050922; DE 60021957 T2 20060209; ES 2246218 T3 20060216; FR 2795127 A1 20001222; FR 2795127 B1 20010914; PT 1061230 E 20051031

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160606

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-12-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: TUBESCA-COMABI, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC

- Ref Document Number: 302328

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20141016

2014-08-12 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: TUBESCA-COMABI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20140806

2014-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ARNOLD AND SIEDSMA AG, CH

2014-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TUBESCA-COMABI, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2014-07-15 [REG CH PFUS] MERGER

- Owner name: COMABI, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFUS

2014-06-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TUBESCA-COMABI SOCIETE EN NOM COLLECTIF, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60021957

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140428

2014-06-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60021957

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HABBEL & HABBEL, DE

- Effective date: 20140428

2014-05-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140501 AND 20140507

2014-04-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60021957

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HABBEL & HABBEL, DE

2014-04-07 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: COMABI, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20140321

2014-04-01 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-04-01 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: TD

- Effective date: 20140402

2013-05-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: TUBESCA-COMABI, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-05-03 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-05-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: TUBESCA-COMABI, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20130329

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2008-09-19 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-07-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060518

2006-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-04-19 [REG IE ERR] ERRATUM

- Ref Legal Event Code: ERR

- Free Format Text: IN JOURNAL 2042, PAGE 654 EUROPEAN PATENT NUMBER 1061230 WAS ADVERTISED IN ERROR AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID.

2006-03-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2006-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2246218

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-12-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20051125

2005-11-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-11-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-11-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Effective date: 20050823

2005-09-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60021957

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-09-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-09-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2005-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2005-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-08-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031105

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001204

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI