Global Patent Index - EP 1061231 A2

EP 1061231 A2 2000-12-20 - Stripper/packer

Title (en)

Stripper/packer

Title (de)

Abstreifer/Abdichtelement

Title (fr)

Racloir/Garniture d'étanchéité

Publication

EP 1061231 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305002 A

Priority

US 33224199 A

Abstract (en)

A stripper/packer (14) for sealing against tubing being moved therethrough includes sealing elements (176) which are urged against a tubing (22) being moved into or removed from a wellbore to isolate the pressure in the wellbore. The sealing elements (176) are comprised of a non-pliable material, preferably an ultra-high molecular weight (UHMW) plastic. The sealing elements (176) are urged into sealing engagement with the tubing (22) so that as the tubing passes therethrough, the wellbore pressure is isolated. The sealing elements (176) may be used in stripper/packers which apply pressure laterally to cause the sealing elements to engage the sides of the tubing, or in stripper/packers that apply pressure to the top and bottom of the sealing element to cause the element to compress and seal around the tubing. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 33/068

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 33/06 (2006.01); E21B 33/068 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 33/06 (2013.01); E21B 33/068 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5566753 A 19961022 - VAN WINKLE D WAYNE [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061231 A2 20001220; EP 1061231 A3 20010131; CA 2311417 A1 20001214; NO 20003013 A 20001215; NO 20003013 D0 20000613

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-04-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040121

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DK GB NL

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010305

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 21B 33/068 A, 7E 21B 33/06 B

2000-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MARSHALL, MIKE E.

2000-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ADAMS, WILLIAM C.

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DK GB NL

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI